|
07/03/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 4600.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 878.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 765.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|