|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1908.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 2258.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1118.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 415.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|