California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB495 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill August 18, 2011
Bill July 5, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011