06/06/2011 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/04/2011 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 860.) | |||
04/28/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/26/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/14/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/11/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |