|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 541.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|