LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB502
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB502
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB502
Compare Versions
SB502 Chaptered October 6, 2011
SB502 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB502 Amended August 15, 2011
SB502 Amended June 29, 2011
SB502 Amended June 15, 2011
SB502 Amended April 25, 2011
SB502 Amended March 24, 2011
SB502 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB502 Chaptered October 6, 2011
SB502 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB502 Amended August 15, 2011
SB502 Amended June 29, 2011
SB502 Amended June 15, 2011
SB502 Amended April 25, 2011
SB502 Amended March 24, 2011
SB502 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare