|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2413.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 3006.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2784.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2735.) . Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments not be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2032.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2006.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 2452.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|