LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB506
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB506
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB506
Compare Versions
SB506 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SB506 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB506 Amended August 18, 2011
SB506 Amended June 21, 2011
SB506 Amended May 5, 2011
SB506 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB506 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SB506 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB506 Amended August 18, 2011
SB506 Amended June 21, 2011
SB506 Amended May 5, 2011
SB506 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare