|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 708, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2333.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 2637.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1173.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 762.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. (Corrected April 11.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|