|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2162.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2630.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 17. Page 703.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 599.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 494.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|