|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 2579.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1173.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 785.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|