California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill July 1, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011