|
08/31/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 199, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 2449.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1086.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 862.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|