01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/11/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 2639.) | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
12/21/2011 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
05/11/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |