|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1228.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1118.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 766.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|