LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB534
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB534
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB534
Compare Versions
SB534 Chaptered September 29, 2011
SB534 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB534 Amended August 26, 2011
SB534 Amended August 15, 2011
SB534 Amended June 28, 2011
SB534 Amended May 31, 2011
SB534 Amended April 25, 2011
SB534 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB534 Chaptered September 29, 2011
SB534 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB534 Amended August 26, 2011
SB534 Amended August 15, 2011
SB534 Amended June 28, 2011
SB534 Amended May 31, 2011
SB534 Amended April 25, 2011
SB534 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare