LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB536
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB536
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB536
Compare Versions
SB536 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB536 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB536 Amended September 2, 2011
SB536 Amended June 21, 2011
SB536 Amended April 12, 2011
SB536 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB536 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB536 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB536 Amended September 2, 2011
SB536 Amended June 21, 2011
SB536 Amended April 12, 2011
SB536 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare