California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB538 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/21/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 538AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 21, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Price FEBRUARY 17, 2011  An act to relating to healing arts.   An act to amend Sections 2701 and 2708 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to nursing.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 538, as amended, Price.  Healing arts.   Nursing.   Existing law, until January 1, 2012, creates within the Department of Consumer Affairs the Board of Registered Nursing, and provides for the board to select an executive director. Under existing law, boards scheduled for repeal are required to be evaluated by the Joint Sunset Review Committee of the Legislature.   This bill would extend the operation of these provisions until January 1, 2016, and would specify that the board is subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.   Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of healing arts licensees by boards within the Department of Consumer Affairs.   This bill would declare the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that would make substantive changes to those healing arts provisions.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 2701 of the   Business and Professions Code  is amended to read:  2701. (a) There is in the Department of Consumer Affairs the Board of Registered Nursing consisting of nine members. (b) Within the meaning of this chapter, board, or the board, refers to the Board of Registered Nursing. Any reference in state law to the Board of Nurse Examiners of the State of California or California Board of Nursing Education and Nurse Registration shall be construed to refer to the Board of Registered Nursing. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2012   2016  , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2012   2016  , deletes or extends that date.  The   Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the  repeal of this section renders the board subject to  the review required by Division 1.2 (commencing with Section 473)   review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature  .  SEC. 2.   Section 2708 of the   Business and Professions Code   is amended to read:  2708. (a) The board shall appoint an executive officer who shall perform the duties delegated by the board and who shall be responsible to it for the accomplishment of those duties. (b) The executive officer shall be a nurse currently licensed under this chapter and shall possess other qualifications as determined by the board. (c) The executive officer shall not be a member of the board. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2012   2016  , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2012   2016  , deletes or extends that date.  SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that would make substantive changes to the healing arts provisions described in Division 2 (commencing with Section 500) of the Business and Professions Code.