California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Amended

Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 27, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 17, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011