|
10/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2465.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3113.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2825.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 848.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|