LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB547
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB547
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB547
Compare Versions
SB547 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB547 Amended August 31, 2011
SB547 Amended August 26, 2011
SB547 Amended August 15, 2011
SB547 Amended July 13, 2011
SB547 Amended June 13, 2011
SB547 Amended May 4, 2011
SB547 Amended March 24, 2011
SB547 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB547 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB547 Amended August 31, 2011
SB547 Amended August 26, 2011
SB547 Amended August 15, 2011
SB547 Amended July 13, 2011
SB547 Amended June 13, 2011
SB547 Amended May 4, 2011
SB547 Amended March 24, 2011
SB547 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare