|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2236.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 2692.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1186.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 862.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|