01/11/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/10/2012 | Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2011 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |