|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 493, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 2575.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1039.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 859.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|