01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/18/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 1053.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/11/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/05/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |