|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1119.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 765.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected April 7.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|