|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2000.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2446.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2390.) Ordered to third reading. (Corrected August 16.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1035.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 765.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|