|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2235.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 876.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 306.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/22/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21.
|
|
|
|
12/21/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|