01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/04/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 884.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/03/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
05/02/2011 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 804.) | |||
05/02/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 739.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |