California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 6, 2012
Bill April 12, 2011