|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 257, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1913.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 2230.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 864.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. (Corrected April 12.)
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|