05/19/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/09/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/04/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/14/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |