|
09/01/2012
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 45. Page 6746.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6251.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1265.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 543.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|