08/25/2011 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/17/2011 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/13/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/02/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1219.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/27/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1112.) (May 26). | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/16/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 861.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/22/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. | |||
12/21/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |