|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2778.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1119.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 855.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|