01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/13/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 620.) (April 12). | |||
03/23/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |