|
06/28/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 643.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|