LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB576
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB576
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB576
Compare Versions
SB576 Chaptered September 29, 2011
SB576 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB576 Amended September 8, 2011
SB576 Amended September 2, 2011
SB576 Amended August 30, 2011
SB576 Amended June 28, 2011
SB576 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB576 Chaptered September 29, 2011
SB576 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB576 Amended September 8, 2011
SB576 Amended September 2, 2011
SB576 Amended August 30, 2011
SB576 Amended June 28, 2011
SB576 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare