California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2011

Amended

Bill June 29, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011