|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2179.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 20. Page 877.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 877.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 599.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 416.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|