01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/28/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 416.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/11/2011 | Set for hearing March 22. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |