06/28/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/21/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
06/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/18/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 856.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
04/05/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |