|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2145.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2511.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2046.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 2046.)
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1174.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 765.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|