|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 716, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2318.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 847.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 579.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|