LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB601
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB601
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB601
Compare Versions
SB601 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB601 Amended September 2, 2011
SB601 Amended June 28, 2011
SB601 Amended May 31, 2011
SB601 Amended April 26, 2011
SB601 Amended March 24, 2011
SB601 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB601 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB601 Amended September 2, 2011
SB601 Amended June 28, 2011
SB601 Amended May 31, 2011
SB601 Amended April 26, 2011
SB601 Amended March 24, 2011
SB601 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare