|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2391.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 958.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 846.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 621.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|