|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2826.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Report received July 8 pursuant to J.R. 61(a)(10).)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 982.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 929.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|