|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2486.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3180.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 9). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3229.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2806.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2863.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 762.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|