California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill July 7, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill April 13, 2011