06/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/04/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/13/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 558.) (April 6). | |||
03/30/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/18/2011 | Set for hearing March 30. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |